judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR. v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN

Case Heading (S-08-0113)
Case Number:S-08-0113Case Docketed On:05/30/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR. v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN
Full Title:WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR., Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWalker Patterson Inman Jr.John D. Bowers
Joshua Tyler Smith
AppelleeDaisha Loraine WilliamsWilliam L. Combs
Other Particpants
Guardian ad litemJean A. Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation, Child Support
Opinion Number:2009 WY 51
Citation:205 P.3d 185

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/30/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/30/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
06/03/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice VoigtNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
07/17/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/22/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/25/2008Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/25/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/24/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee (Called Counsel for additional copy of brief)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received - requested copy of brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/09/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
10/09/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/20/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/20/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/22/2008Order - Assignment of judge Keith G. Kautz to act in this matter and recusing Chief Justice VoigtOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/22/2008Order - Assignment of judge John R. Perry to act in this matter and recusing Justice KiteOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/22/2008Order - Assignment of judge Jeffrey A. Donnell to act in this matter and recusing Justice BurkeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/12/2008Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/09/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/27/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/27/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/29/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal