judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ORENGIL VS. ORENGIL

Case Information: 38243
Short Caption:ORENGIL VS. ORENGILCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D264534Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/27/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12732
07/27/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
08/02/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kivanc Orengil-check no. 5454.
08/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. 'ORDER this appeal DISMISSED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-13347
09/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Extension of time to File Petition for Rehearing, Directing Compliance with NRAP 4, and Requiring payment of Filing Fee for Rehearing Petition. We construe appellant's document of August 31, 2001, as a petition for rehearing of this court's August 7, 2001, order, and in the interest of judicial economy, we excuse its late submission. Under NRS 2.250(1)(b), appellant is required to pay a filing fee of $100 for the petition for rehearing; appellant shall pay this fee within 10 days of the date of this order. The jurisdictional defect in this appeal may be cured if appellant files with the district court an amended notice of appeal from the district court's written order within the time provided by NRAP 4(a). We direct the clerk of this court to file any amended notice of appeal under this docket number. We defer ruling on the petition for rehearing pending receipt of a timely amended notice of appeal and the filing fee for the rehearing petition. 01-15629
09/26/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Kivanc Orengil-check no. 5459.
10/10/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Directing Submission of File-Stamped Amended Notice of Appeal. On September 26, 2001, appellant submitted an amended notice of appeal to this court. It does not bear a district court file stamp. In addition, we have not received any transmission from the district court clerk of an amended notice of appeal. We direct appellant to submit a response to this court within 10 days of the date of this order, stating whether or not the amended notice of appeal was filed with the district court. If so, then appellant shall attach a copy of the amended notice of appeal bearing the district court's stamp. Failure to comply with this order may result in the denial of his rehearing petition. 01-17068
01/24/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from him. Any relief requested therein is denied as moot in light of this order.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 02-01617
02/11/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02019
02/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/26/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 14, 2002. 02-02019