judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5685
A-5685
02/15/1956
Application for Writ of Error
TYLER BANK AND TRUST COMPANY, ET AL.
TYLER BANK AND TRUST COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/09/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/13/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
02/15/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/09/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/13/1956Response to Petition
02/21/1956Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseDismissed
02/18/1956Miscellaneous Motion
02/15/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/15/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tyler Bank and Trust Company, et al.Respondent
Tyler Bank and Trust Company, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information