judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SEARS ROEBUCK AND COMPANY v. LURA BARBARA HOLLINGSWORTH

Case: A-5661
A-5661
02/06/1956
Application for Writ of Error
SEARS ROEBUCK AND COMPANY
LURA BARBARA HOLLINGSWORTH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
07/10/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/10/1956Supplemental Brief filed
02/06/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
10/10/1956Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
07/10/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/27/1956Opinion issued
04/10/1956Supplemental Brief filed
03/07/1956Document received (See Remarks)
03/07/1956Document received (See Remarks)
02/25/1956Letter Filed
02/06/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/06/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sears Roebuck and CompanyPetitioner
Lura Barbara HollingsworthRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information