Case: A-5678
A-5678
02/14/1956
Application for Writ of Error
CHICAGO CORPORATION
MRS. IRMA WALL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/17/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
02/23/1956 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/14/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
02/14/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/17/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/03/1956 | Opinion issued | | ||
05/09/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
05/09/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/23/1956 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/14/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
02/14/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
02/14/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Chicago Corporation | Petitioner | |
Mrs. Irma Wall, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information