judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00284-CV
04-81-00284-CV
09/25/1981
Miscellaneous civil
In Re: Estate of Lazaro Garza Ayala, Deceased
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/04/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
09/14/1983Higher Court DecisionDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
06/18/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/03/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/01/1983Writ of Error filed
06/01/1983Response to Motion Filed
05/17/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/02/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/25/1983Mandate Issued
03/25/1983Mandate Issued
03/22/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/09/1983Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/09/1983Opinion issuedFiling is Moot
03/09/1983Motion to Strike DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/09/1983Motion to Strike DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/09/1983Motion for Stay of Mandate DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/09/1983Opinion issuedFiling is Moot
02/04/1983Motion to Strike Filed
01/25/1983Submission
01/25/1983Submission
01/25/1983Submitted
01/21/1983Motion to Strike Filed
01/19/1983Response to Motion Filed
01/18/1983Reply brief filed
01/12/1983Response to Motion Filed
01/06/1983Motion for Stay of Mandate Filed
01/06/1983Response to Motion Filed
01/06/1983Motion for Leave Filed
09/28/1982Response to Motion Filed
09/21/1982Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/19/1982Motion for Leave Filed
03/17/1982Reply brief filed
03/08/1982Motion to Amend DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/27/1982Response to Motion Filed
01/07/1982Motion to Amend Filed
11/20/1981Brief Filed
11/20/1981Case ready to be set
11/20/1981Case ready to be set
11/12/1981No Description Available.
10/26/1981Brief Filed
09/25/1981Record Filed
09/25/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/25/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court
Webb
Honorable Pat Priest
8,444
n/a