judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DILLBACK (TIMOTHY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38224
Short Caption:DILLBACK (TIMOTHY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR5468Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-12491
08/16/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-13981
08/22/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-14238
08/22/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-14239
09/10/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-15238
09/10/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-15240
09/27/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-16272
10/23/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-16376
10/23/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 25, 2001. 01-16376