judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

REGINALD W. OSBORN V. WACKENHUT SERVICES INC.

Case Information: 10-AA-1254
Short Caption:REGINALD W. OSBORN V. WACKENHUT SERVICES INC.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES1739-10Filed Date:10/12/2010

Opening Event Date:10/12/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/28/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/13/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/09/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/23/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerReginald W. Osborn NPro SeN
RespondentWackenhut Services Inc.N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/12/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
10/12/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
10/26/2010ORDER DENY PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and petitioner is hereby directed to tender the $100 fee within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this petition for review. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is F/O that the lodged petition for review is hereby held in abeyance pending further order of thiscourt. (ETW)
11/03/2010FILING FEE
11/18/2010 ORDERED that the lodged petitionf or review is filed nunc pro tunc to October 12, 2010. It is F/O that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (JAC)
11/18/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
12/27/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 18, 2010, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
01/28/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/ 8/27/10 hearing
01/28/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/02/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/08/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF w/ appendix attached
03/08/2011APPENDIX
05/05/2011 It appearing that the brief of petitioner was filed with this court on March 8, 2011, and the brief of respondent was due to be filed on or before April 12, 2011, but the brief has not yet been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on petitioner's brief alone. (JAC)
06/13/2011 On consideration of this court's order of November 18, 2010, which directed respondent to identify its counsel, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, and it further appearing that respondent's brief was due to be filed on or before May 25, 2011, but the brief has not been filed with this court, ORDERED that this petition for review shall be scheduled for consideration on the record and on the petitioner's brief alone. (ETW)
06/13/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/23/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/09/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Wagner, King, Nebeker
11/30/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Wagner, Nebeker and King, Senior Judge.)
12/23/2011FiledMandate