judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00158-CR
08-82-00158-CR
05/21/1982
Other Felony
Padilla, Alejandro Martinez aka Martin Ortiz Faudoa
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/07/1984Shuck purged
12/01/1982Judgment IssuedDismissed
12/01/1982Mandate Issued
12/01/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/01/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedDismissed
11/17/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
11/17/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/27/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/15/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/29/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/17/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/01/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/17/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
06/23/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/21/1982Record filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/01/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
205th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam W. Callan
31300-205
10 Years