judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00630-CV
05-82-00630-CV
05/21/1982
Automobile Personal Injury
King, Myrtle Green
Shout, Bernard Ignatius
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/26/2018Order enteredDestroy
08/09/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
06/13/2018Letter issued by the court
09/17/1984Mandate Issued
05/17/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/03/1983Letter of Inquiry
05/02/1983Submitted
04/06/1983Submission
12/21/1982Brief Filed
11/22/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/11/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/18/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/08/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/22/1982Response to Motion
09/16/1982Brief Filed
09/15/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/13/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/30/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/18/1982Response to Motion
08/11/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/29/1982Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/23/1982Response to Motion
07/19/1982Statement of Facts Filed
07/12/1982Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/21/1982Transcript Filed
05/14/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
05/14/1982Appeal Bond Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/26/2018Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
191st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Charles Ben Howell
79-3402-J