judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-82-00102-CR
02-82-00102-CR
05/19/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Cullen, Kenneth Michael
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/21/1986Mandate Issued
11/21/1986Mandate Issued
11/05/1986Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/24/1984Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCAMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/1984Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
02/15/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/26/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/20/1984Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/20/1984Motion Filed
01/11/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/19/1983Submitted
10/19/1983Submission
10/05/1983Submission
10/04/1983Brief Filed
07/29/1983Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/28/1983Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/27/1983Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/27/1983Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/05/1983Brief Filed
04/04/1983Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/31/1983Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/05/1983Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/1983Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/08/1982Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1982Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
05/19/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
05/19/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/04/1986Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Tarrant
Honorable John E Bradshaw
24166A
Life & $10,000 fine