judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00357-CR
14-82-00357-CR
05/20/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Williams, Jr., Alvester
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/01/1985Mandate Issued
04/01/1985Record RETURNED from Higher Court
02/27/1985Petition for Discretionary ReviewDENIED
06/25/1984Petition for Discretionary Review
06/12/1984Petition for Discretionary Review
04/26/1984Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
12/15/1983Submission
11/01/1983Case ready to be set
08/10/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
07/12/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
06/02/1983No description available.
09/10/1982No description available.
08/20/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
05/20/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/01/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasCalvin A. Hartmann
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantDeEdward J. Greer
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable WILLIAM HATTEN
336,921
12 yrs.