judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ROY H. KING, ET AL., PAUL B. SCOTT, ET AL., LILYAN CHILSON AND MARY ATKEISON, ET VIR v. LEE E. LOEFFLER

Case: A-2651
A-2651
04/14/1950
Application for Writ of Error
ROY H. KING, ET AL., PAUL B. SCOTT, ET AL., LILYAN CHILSON AND MARY ATKEISON, ET VIR
LEE E. LOEFFLER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/16/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/16/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/28/1951Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
01/25/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/03/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/31/1950Exhibits in case/cause filed
10/25/1950Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/03/1950Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
09/25/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/29/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
04/20/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
04/20/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
04/20/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
04/17/1950Errata FiledPetitioner
04/14/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/26/1951Motion for Leave to file Motion for RehearingDenied
03/16/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/16/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/16/1951Letter Filed
03/12/1951Response to Motion filed
03/12/1951Response to Motion filed
03/01/1951Letter Filed
02/28/1951Brief in Support of Petition
01/25/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/10/1951Opinion issued
11/03/1950Reply to Response
10/31/1950Exhibits in case/cause filed
10/25/1950Response to Brief filed
10/03/1950Brief on the Merits
09/25/1950Supplemental Brief filed
09/25/1950Submission reset
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/29/1950Response to Petition
04/20/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/20/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/20/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/17/1950Errata Filed
04/14/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Paul B. Scott, et al.Petitioner
Lilyan Chilson and Mary Atkeison, et virPetitioner
Carlos B. MastersonAmicus Curiae
John F. DillardAmicus Curiae
Roy H. King, et al.Petitioner
Lee E. LoefflerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information