judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS VS. GROESBECK

Case Information: 33431
Short Caption:WILLIAMS VS. GROESBECKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A378610Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/25/1999How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00275
12/07/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
12/07/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
12/21/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00471
12/21/1998BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. 98-00472
12/21/1998AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief 98-00473
12/21/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returning cost bond submitted today (Frank J. Cremen--Check no. 13304 in the amount of $250.) 98-00475
12/21/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Frank J. Cremen--check no. 13303.
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/19/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued for further negotiations. 99-01139
05/19/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-04120
06/04/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants: 15 days to file two certified copies of the case appeal statement and a transcript /no transcript request. It appears that appellants have filed and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Appellants shall have 10 days after service of the answering brief to file and serve the reply brief. NRAP 31(a)(2). 99-04685
06/11/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Appellants' Certificate Re Order of Transcript. 99-04969
06/11/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-04971
06/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: June 9, 1999. 99-05061
07/07/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 7/6/99. 99-05995
07/07/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Supplement to Answering Brief. 99-05996
07/19/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 7/16/99. 99-06445
07/19/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 99-06446
08/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 99-07962
08/25/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/30/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. 00-19120
01/04/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Reversal and Remand. " . . . we reverse the order of the district court and remand this matter to the district court for recalculation of attorney's fees and reconsideration of an award of costs in light of our decision today." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-00180
01/19/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Compliance with Order of January 4, 2001. (Copy of Order setting this matter for futher proceedings in the Eighth Judicial District Court, received from Mark Gibbons, District Judge.) 01-01276
01/30/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-00644
01/30/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/08/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 6, 2001. 01-00644