judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEITH E. GUINN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0130)
Case Number:S-08-0130Case Docketed On:06/18/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KEITH E. GUINN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEITH E. GUINN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKeith E. GuinnDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jeremy C. Schwendiman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 15
Citation:201 P.3d 423

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/18/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/18/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/05/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant and designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - Jeremy C. Schwendiman, student extern, to appear in this matter on behalf of the State of Wyoming.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
09/17/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee, consent and approval form and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/14/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, jury instructions & verdict; Volume IV, transcripts; Volume V, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/12/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jeremy C. Schwendiman, Student Intern on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Jeremy C. Schwendiman, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Schwendiman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/09/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/11/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion signed for 2/10/09 for Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
02/25/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/25/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/25/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/25/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/27/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Mandate sent to Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary signed for 2/26/09ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
03/02/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/27/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal