judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JARRELL THOMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1289
Short Caption:JARRELL THOMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-27369-09Filed Date:10/19/2010

Opening Event Date:10/19/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/01/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJarrell Thompson Y
Julian S. GreenspunYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Anne Y. ParkYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Julian S. Greespun, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
11/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Julian S. Greenspun, Esquire
11/19/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (5 pgs/Tape - 1/1/2010 proc.)
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (22 pgs/Tape - 1/4/10 proc.)
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (pgs 1 thru 393/Maar - 7/26 thru 7/27/10 proc.)
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (pgs 394 thru 674/Maar - 7/28 thru 7/30/10 proc.)
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (19 pgs/Jeon - 8/2/10 proc.)
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (18 pgs/Tape - 10/15/10 proc.) w/CD
01/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/20/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/25/2011RECORD INDEX
01/25/2011RECORD COPIES
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2 wks. no oppo
02/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 15, 2011. (JAC)
03/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/10/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
04/14/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 42 days. no oppo
04/21/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 26, 2011. (JAC)
05/26/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/26/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
06/15/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/01/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Fisher, Pryor
02/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
03/07/2012FiledMandate