judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-82-00089-CV
02-82-00089-CV
05/21/1982
Other Personal Injury
Coan, Roger E.
Winter, Jr., D.O., Charles E.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/20/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/22/1983Writ DisposedRefused
04/08/1983Writ Filed
03/10/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/07/1983Response Filed
02/28/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Ira Sam Houston
7199