judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00456-CR
01-82-00456-CR
05/19/1982
Burglary
Spencer, Andra Parnell
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/31/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/28/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/18/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/23/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/16/1982Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
05/19/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/31/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
Honorable M. A. LOVE
350,6544
6 yrs probation