judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00620-CR
05-82-00620-CR
05/20/1982
Murder
William Earl O'Donnell
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/01/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/03/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/03/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
07/25/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/01/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
11/03/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/05/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/03/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/09/1982Reporters record filed
08/09/1982Clerks record filed
05/20/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/25/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
O'Donnell, William EarlCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 4
F81-11139-IK
Life