judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00617-CR
05-82-00617-CR
05/20/1982
Sexual Assault
Kenneth L. McClendon
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/11/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/03/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
10/13/1982Motion to withdraw appeal filed
10/13/1982Letter received
10/13/1982Order issuedWithdrawn
10/11/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
09/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/10/1982Clerks record filed
08/10/1982Reporters record filed
05/20/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/13/1982Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McClendon, Kenneth LCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 1
F80-14628-IH
3 years