judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00610-CR
05-82-00610-CR
05/20/1982
Sex Offenses
Tommy Earl Brown, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/10/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/29/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
07/25/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/10/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
01/05/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/09/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
11/08/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/09/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/10/1982Clerks record filed
08/10/1982Reporters record filed
05/20/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/25/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brown, Jr., Tommy EarlCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 1
F8131025-MH
40 years