judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00157-CR
08-82-00157-CR
05/20/1982
Other Felony
Drouillard, John
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/1984Shuck purged
06/04/1984Mandate Issued
12/12/1983Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
11/16/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/16/1983Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
06/17/1983Submitted
05/04/1983Submission
03/10/1983Brief Filed
02/23/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/15/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/09/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/17/1982Brief Filed
11/17/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/1982Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
11/03/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/07/1982Record filed.
10/07/1982Sup. St. of Facts Filed
10/07/1982Supplemental Transcript Filed
05/20/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/04/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
161st District Court
Ector
B-13,498