judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00156-CR
08-82-00156-CR
05/20/1982
Robbery
Tisdale, William
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/15/1985Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/08/1984Decision from Supreme Court or CCANo description available.
06/07/1984Shuck purged
11/21/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/21/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
07/06/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/22/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/22/1983No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/10/1983No description available.
05/11/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/08/1983Submitted
03/02/1983Supplemental Transcript Filed
01/12/1983Submission
12/23/1982Brief Filed
12/08/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/25/1982Brief Filed
08/16/1982Record filed.
05/20/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/21/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
161st District Court
Ector
B-13,654
15 Years