judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-82-00171-CV
13-82-00171-CV
05/21/1982
Miscellaneous civil
International Insurance Company
Hernandez, Jose A.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/22/1983Mandate Issued
11/17/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
11/14/1983Motion for rehearing filed
11/08/1983Motion for rehearing filed
10/27/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/28/1983Submission
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/22/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
105th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Vernon Harville
80-5403-D