judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00051-CV
09-82-00051-CV
05/21/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Maxey, Bryan
City of Lufkin
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/29/1982Case stored
12/29/1982Mandate Issued
11/04/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/02/1982Statement of Facts Filed
06/28/1982Brief Filed
06/10/1982Brief Filed
05/21/1982Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/29/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
159th District Court
Angelina
Honorable David Walker
18,155-80-7