judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-1233
C-1233
05/21/1982
MISC PETITION
MRS. LYNN E. BONNIWELL ET AL.
BEECH AIRCRAFT CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/02/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/01/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/29/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/28/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/27/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/26/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/31/1984Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/19/1984Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/05/1983Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
06/07/1983Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/30/1983Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/12/1983Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/09/1983Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
05/02/1983Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/01/1983Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/24/1983Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/20/1983Post submission brief filedRespondent
12/16/1982Post submission brief filedPetitioner
11/12/1982Response to Reply filedRespondent
06/28/1982Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/21/1982Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/02/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/01/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/29/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/28/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/27/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/26/2020Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/03/1984Response to Motion filed
01/31/1984Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/24/1984Miscellaneous Motion
01/19/1984Motion for Rehearing
07/05/1983Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
06/07/1983Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/30/1983Brief on the Merits
05/12/1983Reply to Response
05/09/1983Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
05/02/1983Response to Motion filed
05/02/1983Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/01/1983Supplemental Brief filed
03/24/1983Motion for Rehearing
01/20/1983Post submission brief filed
12/16/1982Post submission brief filed
11/12/1982Response to Reply filed
06/28/1982Reply to Response
05/21/1982Response to Petition
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BEECH AIRCRAFT CORPORATION Respondent
Edwards, Perry, McMains and ConstantAmicus Curiae
J. Hadley EdcapAmicus Curiae
Mrs. Lynn E. Bonniwell, et al.Petitioner
VINSON AND ELKINSAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information