judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00366-CR
14-82-00366-CR
05/21/1982
Other Drug Possession
Carrington, Jr., Claudis Dean
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/31/1983Mandate Issued
05/03/1983No description available.
03/31/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/21/1983Submission
11/23/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
10/21/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
10/08/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
05/21/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/31/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
10th District Court
Galveston
37,763
3 yrs.