judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BLANCO VS. SCHMIDT

Case Information: 33430
Short Caption:BLANCO VS. SCHMIDTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A385138Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Cary Colt Payne--check no. 2075.
12/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00272
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/05/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. (Late and not on form provided .) 99-00025
01/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: January 8, 1999. 99-00354
01/20/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-00388
01/20/1999Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. 99-00389
01/21/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Document: Docketing Statement. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on January 20, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-00420
01/21/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00389
03/01/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 21, 1999. 99-01388
05/21/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Substitution of Barbara Murphy as Trustee of the Walter Living Trust, Indentification of Counsel for Barbara Murphy, and Stipulation to Dismiss Barbara Murphy, as the Trustee of the Walter J. Matthews Living Trust, Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 99-04231
05/27/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
06/07/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for the Respondents. 99-04737
06/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-04790
08/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant counsel's motion to withdraw. Counsel shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve a copy of this order on respondents and file proof of such service with this court. Respondents shall have 40 days from this order to obtain new counsel to represent them and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. The settlement judge recommends that sanctions be imposed against respondents. Within 30 days from the date new counsel files a notice of appearance with this court, new counsel will be expected to show cause why sanctions against respondents should not be imposed. 99-07407
08/16/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Affidavit of Mailing (re: order filed 8/11/99). 99-07618
04/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. As of this date, respondents have not retained new counsel nor has a response to the order to show cause been filed with this court. In view of respondents' failure to participate in this appeal, we must conclude that they have abandoned their defense rights in this matter. Accordingly, this appeal shall proceed solely on appellant's opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request, and 90 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. On May 21, 1999, a stipulation was filed purporting to substitute Barbara Murphy for respondent Barbara Schmidt as trustee and then purporting to dismss Barbara Murphy from this appeal. In view of respondents' abandonment of their defense in this appeal and the ambiguous nature of the stipulation, we disapprove the stipulation. 00-06682
05/16/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 00-08142
05/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dimissal filed on May 16, 2000, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK 00-08667
05/24/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.