judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDREW J. LARSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF WYOMING, ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections, and MICHAEL J. MURPHY, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary

Case Heading (S-08-0128)
Case Number:S-08-0128Case Docketed On:06/13/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:ANDREW J. LARSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF WYOMING, ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections, and MICHAEL J. MURPHY, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary
Full Title:ANDREW J. LARSON, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF WYOMING, ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections, and MICHAEL J. MURPHY, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary, Respondents.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerAndrew Joseph Larson Pro Se
RespondentThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey
RespondentAttorney General's Office - Attorney GeneralBruce A. Salzburg
RespondentRobert O. LampertBruce A. Salzburg
RespondentMichael J. MurphyBruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/13/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/13/2008Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
06/13/2008Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
06/13/2008Motion - Other For the Court to compell the Wyoming State Penitentiary to Comply with Federal Access LawsMotionOtherFinal
06/13/2008Motion - Other - DiscoveryMotionOtherFinal
06/13/2008Motion - Appointment of counselMotionAppointment of counselFinal
06/13/2008Motion - Other - for Evidentiary HearingMotionOtherFinal
06/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Attachment to Exhibits #18Notice-IncomingAttachmentFinal
06/25/2008Response/Objection - Petition for review and ancillary motionsResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
07/01/2008Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
07/01/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/03/2008Correspondence - Outgoing other - returned Response to State's Motion to dismiss petition for writ of review for post conviction remedy in Larson v. State No. 28-553 without filing.CorrespondenceOutgoing otherFinal
07/14/2008Correspondence - Outgoing other - returned petition for re-review on dismissal of petition for post conviction remedy without filing.CorrespondenceOutgoing otherFinal