judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

RICHARD W. NORTON, JR., ET AL. v. KLEBERG COUNTY, TEXAS

Case: A-2652
A-2652
04/17/1950
Application for Writ of Error
RICHARD W. NORTON, JR., ET AL.
KLEBERG COUNTY, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/12/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/03/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
04/26/1950Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
04/19/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/05/1950Opinion issued
06/12/1950Supplemental Brief filed
06/03/1950Response to Petition
05/10/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/26/1950Supplement to Petition filed
04/19/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/17/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Richard W. Norton, Jr., et al.Petitioner
KLEBERG COUNTY, TEXASRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information