judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-82-00172-CV
11-82-00172-CV
05/20/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Harbour, Kenneth Jdarell
Cogburn, Alta Joyce
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/24/1984Mandate issued
09/21/1983Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
07/13/1983Application for writ of error disposedReversed & Affirmed
03/29/1983Case forwarded to higher court
03/25/1983Express fee paid
03/25/1983Application fee paid
03/25/1983Application for writ of error
05/20/1982TR filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/01/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
220th District Court
Comanche
Honorable Floyd R Wilson
12,479