judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-09769-CV
06-89-09769-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Huff, Charles
Variety Steel, Inc.
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/02/1990Mandate Issued
08/29/1989Opinion issuedReversed and Vacated
08/15/1989Submitted
08/15/1989Submission
07/13/1989Submission
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/02/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
113th District Court
Harris
Honorable Geraldine B Tennant
85-32797