judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00177-CR
11-89-00177-CR
07/11/1989
Probation Revocation
Sang, Do Quang
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/08/1990Mandate issued
11/09/1989Opinion issued
11/09/1989Opinion issued
11/09/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed as Reformed
10/02/1989Submitted
10/02/1989Submission set in Eastland
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
Honorable Robert Montgomery
421,297
2 yrs. TDC