judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00179-CV
11-89-00179-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Maxey, Bryan
DeWitt, Mary
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/08/1991Mandate issued
02/05/1991Case returned from higher court
01/30/1991Mot. - For rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/09/1991Application for writ of error disposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/10/1990Case forwarded to higher court
12/10/1990Miscellaneous filing
12/10/1990Application fee paid
12/10/1990Express fee paid
12/03/1990Miscellaneous filing
11/29/1990Application fee requested
11/29/1990Application for writ of error
11/29/1990Express fee requested
11/29/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
11/13/1990Application for writ of error received
11/12/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
11/02/1990Letter filed from . . .
10/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/06/1990Supp. brief filed
05/23/1990Supp. brief filed
05/21/1990Submitted
05/21/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/27/1990Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/08/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dewitt, MaryAppelleeRobert Charles Graves
Maxey, BryanAppellantBryan Maxey
Trial Court Information
Probate Court
Galveston
Honorable Jerome Jones
37,407