judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00185-CV
11-89-00185-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Gallagher, Jr., Thomas J.
Insurance Corporation of America
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/03/1990Mandate issued
02/01/1990Opinion issued
02/01/1990Opinion issued
02/01/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/03/1989Submitted
10/03/1989Submission set in Eastland
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/03/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gallagher, Jr., Thomas J.Appellant
Deyo-FawcettAppellee
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
Honorable Ann Tyrrell Cochran
86-56167