judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-09773-CV
06-89-09773-CV
07/11/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
Shepherd, Susan Elaine
Davis, Barbara Sue
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/24/1990Mandate Issued
12/05/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/13/1989Submitted
11/13/1989Submission
10/06/1989Submission
07/25/1989Motion for continuance of oral argument disposed.Motion or Writ Granted
07/21/1989Motion for continuance of oral argument
07/13/1989Submission
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/24/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
133rd District Court
Harris
Honorable Lamar McCorkle
86-02719