judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-09772-CV
06-89-09772-CV
07/11/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
Adesina, Joseph, Et Al
Albert Gerald Mani
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/16/1990Mandate Issued
02/20/1990Motion-ext. time file app.writ of error disposedOverruled
02/12/1990Motion - ext. file application for writ of error
01/16/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
01/12/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/28/1989Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/19/1989Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/05/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/16/1989Submitted
11/16/1989Submission
10/06/1989Submission
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/16/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No. 4
Harris
Honorable Charles Coussons
520,246