judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00180-CV
11-89-00180-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Kendrick, Michael, Ind. and as NF for Natasha Lynn Kendrick
Smith, M.D. Richard G. and Piney Point Pediatric Associates
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/11/1990Mandate issued
02/22/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposed
02/22/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
02/09/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
01/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/04/1989Submitted
10/04/1989Submission set in Eastland
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/11/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kendrick, MichaelAppellant
Smith & Piney PediatricsAppellee
Trial Court Information
151st District Court
Harris
82-43,730