judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-89-00177-CR
10-89-00177-CR
07/11/1989
Theft
Lee Aulton Jones
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/13/2017Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/10/1992Case stored
07/10/1992Mandate issued by this CourtReversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct.
06/24/1992Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/12/1991Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
03/01/1991Petition for discretionary review filed
02/07/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/18/1990Submitted
10/18/1990No Description Available.
10/18/1990Submission
06/14/1990No Description Available.
06/14/1990Submission
05/17/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/17/1990No Description Available.
04/19/1990No Description Available.
04/12/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/12/1990Response to motion
04/05/1990No Description Available.
03/08/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/06/1990No Description Available.
01/04/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/02/1990No Description Available.
12/06/1989No Description Available.
11/09/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/03/1989No Description Available.
10/24/1989No Description Available.
10/02/1989No Description Available.
08/16/1989No Description Available.
07/11/1989No Description Available.
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/08/1989No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/13/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasJ. Keith Meredith
Jones, Lee AultonAppellantCharles W. McDonald
Trial Court Information
87th District Court
Freestone
Honorable H. D. Black
89-024-CR
6 years