judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONALD P. MENZIES V. GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, ET AL

Case Information: 97-CV-1139
Short Caption:DONALD P. MENZIES V. GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA9894-96Filed Date:06/27/1997

Opening Event Date:06/27/1997Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/20/1998Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/07/1998
Argued/Submitted:06/22/1999
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/23/1999

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonald P. Menzies NPro SeN
AppelleeGeorge Washington UniversityN
Michael Dymersky NN
Sarah Mulkern Phelps YN
AppelleeSusan Sell N
Michael Dymersky NN
AppelleeJames Lebovic N
Michael Dymersky NN
AppelleeBarbara Farmer N
Michael Dymersky NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/27/1997NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/06/1997APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
08/08/1997COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Granted
08/08/1997MOTION(S) FEE PAID
08/21/1997APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION to appellee's motion to docket and dismiss appeal
08/21/1997MOTION(S) FEE PAID
08/21/1997RECEIVED appelllant's opposition to appellee's motion to docket and dismiss appeal
08/21/1997APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS
08/21/1997MOTION(S) FEE PAID
08/21/1997RECEIVED - ADS, DR & SRT
08/21/1997$50.00 DOCKETING FEE
09/02/1997APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION -to aplt's motion for leave to file documents out of time
09/29/1997ORD GRT COUNSEL MO TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONand the appearance of Richard M. Sissman, Esquire, is hereby withdrawn.
09/29/1997ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS , DR, SRT and the Clerk shall file the lodged docketing statement, designation of record and statement regarding transcript.
09/29/1997APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT
09/29/1997DESIGNATION OF RECORD
09/29/1997STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
09/29/1997ORD GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OPPOSITIONand the Clerk shall file the lodge opposition to appellee{s motion to dismiss.
09/29/1997APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION ( to appellee's motion to dismiss).
09/29/1997ORDER DENY APLE MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL as moot. (BY: AMW) sw
10/07/1997COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD
03/10/1998ORDER: Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, make the necessary arrangements to have the record on appeal transmitted to this court. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 11 and 14. (By: GP)
03/20/1998RECORD ON APPEAL
03/20/1998RECORD COMPLETED
05/18/1998ORDER: The brief of appellant_ shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee_ shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: GP)
07/10/1998ORDER: Appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, file the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the brief out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 14. (By: GP)
07/16/1998LETTER from Atty Sissman re order granting his withdrawal as counsel for aplt
07/18/1998LETTER from previously appointed counsel regardingorder withdrawing his appearance and recurrance of receipt of court mailings.
07/28/1998It appearing that Thomas E. Cackett was admitted to the bar of this court pro hac vice for the purpose of representing Donald Patrick Menezies with regard to CA 9894-96, which was brought in the Supeiro Court of the District of Columbia, and it further appearing that Thomas E. Cackett has submitted pleadings with respect the instant appeal, no. 97-CV-1139, without having obtained approval for pro hac vice admission for the purpose of this appeal, and it furthermore appearing that the attorney on whose motion Thomas E. Cackett as admitted pro hac vice for participation in CA 9894-96 in the trial court has been permitted to withdraw his appearance in this court as co-counsel for appellant, and it furthermore appearing that, by order of the Maryland Court of Appeals, dated May 4, 1998, Thomas E. Cackett was disbarred by consent, effective May 4, 1998, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that Thomas E. Cackett shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, show cause why his appearance in this appeal should not be withdrawn. (By: AMW)
08/10/1998RECEIVED - aplt's mot for leave to file brief & aplt's brief (no cert of service signature or rule 27)
08/25/1998ORDERED, sua sponte, that the appearance of Thomas E. Cackett, Esquire is hereby withdrawn as counsel for appellant. It is F/ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court, within 20 days from the date of this order, as to the identity of new counsel, or if appellant intends to proceed on appeal pro se. It is F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, file his brief. (By: AMW)
10/01/1998APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
10/01/1998RECEIVED - aplt's brief
10/01/1998CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED
10/05/1998ORDER: Grant motion of appellant for leave to file the brief, and the lodged brief of appellant is filed. F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed on or before November 5, 1998. (By: GP)
10/05/1998APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/27/1998APPEARANCE- of Michael A. Dymersky, Patrick J. Massarum & Hamilton and Hamilton, LLP on behalf of aple
10/27/1998APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (The George Washington, Susan Sell, James Lebovic and Barbara Farmer)
10/29/1998ORDER: Grant the motion of appellees for an extension of time, and the brief of appellees shall be filed on or before December 7, 1998______. (By: GP)
11/02/1998APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to direct that material matter omitted from the record be supplied no oppo
11/02/1998MOTION(S) FEE PAID
11/05/1998APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
11/05/1998MOTION(S) FEE PAID
11/17/1998ORDERED that the motions of appellees are granted,and appellant_ shall make the necessary arrangements to have the item(s) specified in appellee__'s motion prepared and transmitted to this court as a supplemental record forthwith. It is F/O that the brief of appellees remains due on or before December 7, 1998. (BY: AMW)
12/03/1998SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (pleading filed in superior court)
12/07/1998APPELLEE'S BRIEF
12/07/1998BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/22/1998FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
12/22/1998LETTER TO COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING
12/24/1998APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo to 1/26/99
12/24/1998MOTION(S) FEE PAID
12/29/1998COPY OF SUPERIOR COURT LETTER - sent to aplt's attorney re: pay and pick up supplemental record from ACO
01/08/1999ORD GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF, and the reply brief shall be filed on or before January 26, 1999. (By: GP)
02/04/1999APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo
02/04/1999MOTION(S) FEE PAID
02/04/1999RECEIVED - aplt's reply brief
02/11/1999TMC - Aplt's motion for leave to file reply brief - Aplt's reply brief (lodged)
02/16/1999ORDER DENY APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF in excess of page limit, and appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, file a reply brief, if any, in compliance with D.C. App. R. 28 (g). (by: FARZPY)
03/08/1999APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
04/30/1999CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/22/1999FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/22/1999ARGUED (WG,SC,RD) Donald P. Menzies, pro se, appellant. Michael Dymersky, Esquire, for appellee.
07/01/1999AFFIRMED MOJ (WG,SC,RD)
07/23/1999MANDATE ISSUED