judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-09775-CV
06-89-09775-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Brazos County Appraisal District & The Appraisal Review
Sun Operating Limited Partnership
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/25/1991Mandate Issued
09/06/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/16/1989Submitted
08/16/1989Submission
07/13/1989Submission
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/25/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
361st District Court
Brazos
Honorable Carolyn L. Ruffino
30,188-361