judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-2638
A-2638
04/08/1950
Application for Writ of Error
RENFRO DRUG COMPANY, CAPITAL NATIONAL BANK IN AUSTIN
H. L. LEWIS, EDWARD JOSEPH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/21/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/19/1950Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/13/1950Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/12/1950Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/07/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/03/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
04/28/1950Response to Reply filedRespondent
04/26/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/26/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
04/08/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
04/08/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/19/1951Returned document(s). See Remarks.
12/21/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/06/1950Opinion issued
10/19/1950Response to Brief filed
10/13/1950Response to Brief filed
10/12/1950Response to Brief filed
10/07/1950Supplemental Brief filed
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/03/1950Response to Petition
04/28/1950Response to Reply filed
04/26/1950Reply to Response
04/26/1950Response to Petition
04/08/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/08/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/08/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Edward JosephRespondent
Renfro Drug CompanyPetitioner
Capital National Bank in AustinPetitioner
H. L. LewisRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information