judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TEREATHA GLASGOW V. UNION CENTER PLAZA

Case Information: 10-AA-1299
Short Caption:TEREATHA GLASGOW V. UNION CENTER PLAZAClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES020959-10Filed Date:10/25/2010

Opening Event Date:10/25/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/14/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/10/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerTereatha GlasgowYPro SeN
RespondentUnion Center PlazaN
Susanne Harris CarnellYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/25/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
10/25/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
11/15/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to October 25, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
11/15/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
12/14/2010APPEARANCE of Susan Carnell on behalf of resp
01/25/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/ hearing of 10/5/10
01/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/28/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/03/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 60-90 days
03/18/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioner's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 9, 2011. (JAC)
06/09/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
06/09/2011APPENDIX
06/22/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to Aug.1, 2011
06/28/2011PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION to motion for ext of time to file brief.
07/06/2011RESPONDENT'S REPLY - in support of motion for enlargement of time
07/11/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to Aug.1, 2011
07/28/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
07/28/2011FiledAppendix (Respondent) (attached to brief)
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/14/2011FiledSubmitted before Newman, Belson, Schwelb
12/14/2011FiledChange Of Address Received From (Petitioner)
12/19/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Newman, Belson and Schwelb, Senior Judges.)
01/10/2012FiledMandate