judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BACARDI-MARTINI USA VS. SOUTHERN WINE AND SPIRITS

Case Information: 33444
Short Caption:BACARDI-MARTINI USA VS. SOUTHERN WINE AND SPIRITSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9804507Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/08/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/09/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Woodburn & Wedge--check no. 51379.
12/09/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00309
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry R. Hicks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/23/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Notice of Entry filed 11/4/98. Due Date: 10 days
12/28/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00515
12/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: November 4, 1998. 98-00557
12/31/1998Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 98-00585
01/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt.
02/26/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-01319
03/10/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of the appeal. 99-01668
03/17/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 99-01930
03/26/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 99-02217
03/26/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.