judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AVIAT AIRCRAFT, INC., a Wyoming Corporation v. EDWARD SAURENMAN

Case Heading (S-08-0143)
Case Number:S-08-0143Case Docketed On:07/03/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:AVIAT AIRCRAFT, INC., a Wyoming Corporation v. EDWARD SAURENMAN
Full Title:AVIAT AIRCRAFT, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, Appellant (Defendant), v. EDWARD SAURENMAN, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAviat Aircraft, Inc., a Wyoming corporationJ. Kent Rutledge
James Kaste
AppelleeEdward SaurenmanPeter R. Tolley
Ford T. Bussart

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Personal
Opinion Number:2009 WY 98
Citation:213 P.3d 956

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/03/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/03/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/15/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/15/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/02/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee. Called counsel for appellee and requested a signature page.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - signature page with original signaturesNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
10/08/2008Event - Deficient pleading returned. Received application for admission pro hac vice, which was the application required by the Wyoming State Bar. Contacted Mr. Tolley and informed him that he needed to have local counsel motion for his admission here, but does not need to go through the bar process again. Returned application this date.EventDeficient pleading returnedFinal
10/14/2008Motion - Withdrawal of counsel, Marvin L. TylerMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
10/14/2008Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
10/14/2008Motion - Admission pro hac vice Peter R. Tolley on behalf of appelleeMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
10/14/2008Order - Grant admission pro hac viceOrderGrantFinal
10/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/20/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/21/2008Service - Certificate of serviceServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
10/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellant and amended certificate of serviceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Peter Tolley for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - J. Kent Rutledge for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/03/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (J. Kent Rutledge for appellant; Ford T. Bussart and Peter R. Tolley, argument by Mr. Tolley for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/14/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/01/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/01/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/08/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/3/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal