judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-09768-CV
06-89-09768-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
National Convenience Stores, Inc.
Albert Martinez, Et Ux
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/29/1990Mandate Issued
11/13/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
09/06/1990Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/09/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/19/1990Writ Filed
02/02/1990Motion-ext. time file app.writ of error disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/22/1989Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/12/1989Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
11/15/1989Submitted
11/15/1989Submission
10/06/1989Submission
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
281st District Court
Harris
Honorable Louis M Moore
83-36286