judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-09767-CV
06-89-09767-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Winter Garden Medical Center, Inc.
Tinsley Physical Therapy, Inc.
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/12/1990Mandate Issued
11/07/1989Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
11/07/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/1989Motion for leave to file
10/06/1989Submission
07/11/1989
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/12/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
165th District Court
Harris
Honorable Kenneth D Harrison
86-41392