judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-00062-CR
06-89-00062-CR
07/11/1989
All Misdemeanors
Mayorga, Sandra L.
The State of Texas
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/22/1990Mandate issued
12/05/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/14/1989Submitted
11/14/1989Submission
11/09/1989Brief Filed
11/09/1989Brief Filed
09/12/1989Letter re late appellant's brief
08/22/1989Submitted
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No. 5
Harris
Honorable Hannah Lai Chow
4200
$750 fine