judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-94-00122-CR
02-94-00122-CR
04/08/1994
Robbery
Carson, Arthur Dwayne a/k/a Arthur Dewayne Carson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1996Mandate Issued
11/22/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
10/02/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
08/31/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/10/1995Response Filed
07/31/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/13/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/10/1995Letter Brief Filed
06/15/1995Letter Brief Filed
06/06/1995Letter
05/31/1995Submitted
05/31/1995Submission
05/26/1995Letter
03/31/1995Brief Filed
03/31/1995Case ready to be set
11/28/1994Brief Filed
07/18/1994Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
07/18/1994Submission
04/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Carson, Arthur DwayneCriminal - AppellantAllan K. Butcher, Jr.
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable Roger E. Towery
0514777D
40 YRS IDTDCJ