judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-09761-CV
06-89-09761-CV
07/11/1989
Injunction
Marcus Jones Buick, Inc.
Donald A. Fonte
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/22/1990Mandate Issued
12/05/1989Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
11/15/1989Submitted
11/15/1989Submission
10/06/1989Submission
07/11/1989
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable Richard Millard
83-06417